This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/12/2022 at 10:03:58 (UTC).

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC vs XR ELECTRIC LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against XR ELECTRIC LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendants

ESPERON, EXZAR ; AKA : ESPERON, EXZAR VICENCIO

XR ELECTRIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

13475 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service - Esperion

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: ESPERON, EXZAR

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - XR Electric

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC

Request for Entry of Default - Esperion

Request for Entry of Default filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: ESPERON, EXZAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: ESPERON, EXZAR; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: ESPERON, EXZAR; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC was entered as to ESPERON, EXZAR on Complaint . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/02/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC. Refers to: XR ELECTRIC LLC; ESPERON, EXZAR; Filed By: ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.