This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/08/2022 at 10:37:24 (UTC).

Onesource Distributors LLC vs Filtronics Inc

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 Onesource Distributors LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Filtronics Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onesource Distributors LLC

Defendant

Filtronics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD P C

13475 Danielson Street Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC was entered as to Filtronics Inc on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Filtronics Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Filtronics, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.