This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 03:26:34 (UTC).

OneSource Distributors LLC vs Empire Solar Group LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 OneSource Distributors LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Empire Solar Group LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onesource Distributors LLC

Defendants

Empire Solar Group LLC; DBA : Empire Solar Electric Group

Partida, Samuel Adolfo

Roseburg, Amanda Dee

The Western Surety Company

Western Surety Company; ESA : The Western Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Defendant Attorneys

Shapiro, Joseph Morris

Sosa, Carlos E.

 

Court Documents

General Denial

General Denial filed by Western Surety Company.

Ex Parte Notice and Application of OneSource Distributors, LLC RE: Application for Prejudgment Writ of Attachment against Amada Dee Roseburg

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment

Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Application for Right to Attach Order; Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

OneSource Distributors, LLC's Index of Exhibits and Exhibits in Support of Application of OneSource Distributors, LLC for: Prejudgment Writ of Attachment against Amanda Dee Roseburg

Exhibit List (Index of Exhibits and Exhibits in Support of Application) filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/16/2021 08:45:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Undertaking submitted by Onesource Distributors LLC rejected on 09/16/2021.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Undertaking

Undertaking (OF CORPORATE SURETY $10,000) filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment

Right to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal - Amanda Dee Roseburg

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Roseburg, Amanda

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal - Western Surety

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Western Surety Company

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute - Samuel A. Partida

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Partida, Samuel

Amanda Roseburg's Motion to Dismiss Onesource's Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim

Motion to Dismiss filed by Roseburg, Amanda Dee.

Complaint of OneSource Distributors, LLC

[A document for ROA# 1]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 2]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Roseburg, Amanda; Partida, Samuel; The Western Surety Company

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss filed by Roseburg, Amanda Dee. Filed By: Roseburg, Amanda Dee (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Roseburg, Amanda Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Western Surety Company Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Partida, Samuel Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRight to Attach Order After Hearing and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUndertaking (OF CORPORATE SURETY $10,000) filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/16/2021 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Roseburg, Amanda; Partida, Samuel; Western Surety Company Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Roseburg, Amanda; Partida, Samuel; Western Surety Company Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Roseburg, Amanda; Partida, Samuel; Western Surety Company Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Roseburg, Amanda; Partida, Samuel; Western Surety Company Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less