This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 07:49:20 (UTC).

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC VS CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onesource Distributors LLC

Defendants

BACON, TIMOTHY ERNEST; AKA : BACON, TIM

CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD PC

13475 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Ronald Frazier effective 02/08/2022

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 18]

Request for Entry of Default

[Another document for ROA# 18]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY; CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY; CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC was entered as to BACON, TIMOTHY ERNEST on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 18]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 18]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Onesource Distributors LLC was entered as to CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Ronald Frazier effective 02/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: CONTROL DYNAMICS CORPORATION; BACON, TIMOTHY; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less