This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/22/2022 at 10:38:00 (UTC).

Onesource Distributors LLC vs Cadence Aerospace LLC

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Onesource Distributors LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cadence Aerospace LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Onesource Distributors LLC

Defendants

Arden Engineering Inc

Cadence Aerospace LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

Attorney at SCHOLEFIELD PC CONSTRUCTION LAW

13475 Danielson Street 100

Poway, CA 92064

Defendant Attorney

SANTOS, ROWENA

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

18565 Jamboree Road 500

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc

COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC

Complaint filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc

Defendants Cadence Aerospace, LLC and Arden Engineering, Inc.'s Answer

Answer filed by Arden Engineering Inc; Cadence Aerospace LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Arden Engineering Inc; Cadence Aerospace LLC.; Filed By: Arden Engineering Inc (Defendant); Cadence Aerospace LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Refers to: Cadence Aerospace LLC; Arden Engineering Inc; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cadence Aerospace LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOLEFIELD, PAMELA J.