Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 07:10:16 (UTC).

OneMain Financial Group LLC vs Diferretti

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 OneMain Financial Group LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Diferretti. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A

Defendant

Diferretti, Giuliano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 13]

Request for Entry of Default

The default filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A was denied. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) submitted by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A rejected on 11/13/2020. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Application and Order Correcting Court Record

Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 1) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 13]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A was denied. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) submitted by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A rejected on 11/13/2020. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA 1) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A. Refers to: Diferretti, Giuliano Filed By: OneMain Financial Group LLC Successor by Merger to OneMain Financial Services INC as Servicer for Wilmington Trust NA as Issuer Loan Trustee for Springleaf Funding Trust 2017-A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Scott Kennard