This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:22:05 (UTC).

On Tap Credit Union vs. Thompson

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 On Tap Credit Union filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Thompson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ON TAP CREDIT UNION; FDBA : COORS CREDIT UNION

Defendants

THOMPSON, LUIZ MINDA

THOMPSON, ERIC B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEALD, DANIEL A

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration Regarding accrued interest) filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry

Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz

Abstract of Judgment issued

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Luiz

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration Regarding accrued interest) filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Notice of Entry filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for On Tap Credit Union and against Thompson, Eric B ;Thompson, Luiz Minda for $ 11177.04, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 262.12, prejudgment costs: $ 370.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 11809.16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketSister-State Judgment filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 903.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by On Tap Credit Union. Refers to: Thompson, Eric; Thompson, Luiz Filed By: On Tap Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less