This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2023 at 05:58:24 (UTC).

Olson vs National AVC LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Olson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National AVC LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olson, Chelsea

Defendant

National AVC LLC; DBA : Thrive Pet Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marquez, Justin F.

Defendant Attorney

Shadi, Sabrina L.

 

Court Documents

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

Summons

Original Summons filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint

Answer filed by National AVC LLC.

Defendant's Notice to the Court and to Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by National AVC LLC.

PLAINTIFF CHELSEA OLSONS NOTICE OF REMAND OF ACTION TO STATE COURT

Notice of Order Remanding Case to State Court filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Natoinal AVC, LLC's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National AVC LLC.

Plaintiff Chelsea Olson's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance filed by National AVC LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/20/2023 02:30:00 PM.

Notice of Plaintiff Chelsea Olson's Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Olson, Chelsea.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Olson, Chelsea.; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/20/2023 02:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketJury demanded by All parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2024 at 08:30AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 10:45AM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Olson, Chelsea.; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less