This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 06:13:23 (UTC).

Olson vs National AVC LLC

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Olson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against National AVC LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olson, Chelsea

Defendant

National AVC LLC; DBA : Thrive Pet Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marquez, Justin F.

Defendant Attorney

Shadi, Sabrina L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order Granting Joint Stipulation and Application for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates

Notice - Other (OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES) filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Joint Stipulation and Application for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates; [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Signed 6/6/23) filed by Olson, Chelsea; National AVC LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by National AVC LLC.

FIRST AMENDED CLASS & REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CLASS & REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Olson, Chelsea.

JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CLASS & REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Olson, Chelsea; National AVC LLC.

Notice of Minute Order

Notice - Other (of Minute Order) filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Notice of Plaintiff Chelsea Olson's Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/20/2023 02:30:00 PM.

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance filed by National AVC LLC.

Plaintiff Chelsea Olson's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Natoinal AVC, LLC's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by National AVC LLC.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 02:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

PLAINTIFF CHELSEA OLSONS NOTICE OF REMAND OF ACTION TO STATE COURT

Notice of Order Remanding Case to State Court filed by Olson, Chelsea.

Defendant's Notice to the Court and to Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by National AVC LLC.

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint

Answer filed by National AVC LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2024
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (OF ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES) filed by Olson, Chelsea.; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 10/11/2024 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 10/11/2024 at 10:45:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2024 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketThe Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 11/01/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Signed 6/6/23) filed by Olson, Chelsea; National AVC LLC.; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff); National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by National AVC LLC.; Filed By: National AVC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Olson, Chelsea. Refers to: National AVC LLC; Filed By: Olson, Chelsea (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less