Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 10:06:20 (UTC).

Oliva vs Figueroa

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Oliva filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Figueroa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Oliva, Argelia

Respondents

Figueroa, Sonia

Ramos, Sonia ; ESA : Figueroa, Sonia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LARA, GENARO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/28/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketResponse to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Ramos, Sonia. Refers to: Oliva, Argelia Filed By: Ramos, Sonia (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Continuance filed by Figueroa, Sonia. Refers to: Oliva, Argelia Filed By: Ramos, Sonia (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Figueroa, Sonia. Refers to: Oliva, Argelia Filed By: Ramos, Sonia (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Oliva, Argelia. Refers to: Ramos, Sonia Filed By: Oliva, Argelia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Oliva, Argelia. Refers to: Ramos, Sonia Filed By: Oliva, Argelia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oliva, Argelia. Refers to: Ramos, Sonia Filed By: Oliva, Argelia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Partly GRANTED and partly DENIED) filed by Oliva, Argelia. Refers to: Ramos, Sonia Filed By: Oliva, Argelia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Oliva, Argelia. Refers to: Ramos, Sonia Filed By: Oliva, Argelia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 02/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    Read MoreRead Less