Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 01:52:39 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY vs MOUNTASIR

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MOUNTASIR. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Old Republic Surety Company

Defendants

WESLEY, WILLIAM

GOMEZ, PHYLLIS

MOUNTASIR, TAHA ; DBA : INTEGRITY AUTO SALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Carlos E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Complaint in Interpleader

Complaint in Interpleader filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint in Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Bowman, Blaine for 09/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM Filed By: Old Republic Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM Filed By: Old Republic Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Old Republic Surety Company. Refers to: MOUNTASIR, TAHA; GOMEZ, PHYLLIS; WESLEY, WILLIAM Filed By: Old Republic Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E