This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 03:20:45 (UTC).

Old Republic National Title Insurance Company vs Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Old Republic National Title Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Old Republic National Title Insurance Company

Old Republic Title Company

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC

Calmwater Capital 3 LLC

HG Capital XI LLC

US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP

HG Capital X LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett, Robert

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Anderson, Robyn L.

Roje, Alexandra A

Jewett, Bradley E

LEDERMAN, JEFFREY J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/07/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/12/2021 08:30:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Case Management Statement filed by Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service filed by Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 11:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Defendant And Cross Complainant Pontus Mag Fairfield, Llc Notice Of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company.

HG Capital X, LLC, et al.'s Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by HG Capital X LLC; HG Capital XI LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by HG Capital X LLC; HG Capital XI LLC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Refers to: Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPLICATION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF ROBYN L ANDERSON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA ROJE

Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC.

PROPOSED ORDER FOR LIMITED ADMISSION OF ROBYN L ANDERSON

Proposed Order submitted by Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC received but not filed on 03/16/2021.

Answer

Answer filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company.

Answer

Answer filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Refers to: Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP Filed By: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Calmwater Capital 3 LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 09:45AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 11:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Refers to: Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC; HG Capital X LLC; HG Capital XI LLC; Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP Filed By: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Refers to: Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC; HG Capital X LLC; HG Capital XI LLC; Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP Filed By: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Refers to: Pontus MAG Fairfield LLC; HG Capital X LLC; HG Capital XI LLC; Calmwater Capital 3 LLC; US Real Estate Credit Holdings III LP Filed By: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less