Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 01:26:22 (UTC).

Ocampo vs. Figueroa

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Ocampo filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Figueroa. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ocampo, Lidia Aurora

Respondent

Figueroa, Tania Yolanda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 02/07/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 02/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in N-03 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned from N-02 to N-03 effective 12/22/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketAttorney Frank Pabst request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 02/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/13/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order filed by Ocampo, Lidia Aurora. Refers to: Figueroa, Tania Filed By: Ocampo, Lidia Aurora (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less