Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:12:57 (UTC).

O Hara vs Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 O Hara filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O Hara, Kyle

Defendants

Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC

Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC

Chinois SD Inc

Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spivak, David G

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Carnitas Snack Shack I, LLC

Proof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Carnitas Snack Shack II, LLC

Proof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Carnitas Snack Shack III, LLC

Proof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Order signed 6/8/2021) filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Carnitas Snack Shack II, LLC

Proof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle.

of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Carnitas Snack Shack III, LLC

Proof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC

Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Entire Action Against Defendants Carnitas Snack Shack II, LLC and Carnitas Snack Shack III, LLCDismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Declaration of David G. Spivak in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Entire Action Against Defendants Carnitas Snack Shack II, LLC and Carnitas Snack Shack III, LLC

Declaration - Other filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Proposed Order Dismissing Entire Class Action Complaint against Defendants Carnitas Snack Shack II, LLC and Carnitas Snack Shack III, LLC

Order - Other filed by O Hara, Kyle.

Complaint

Complaint filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc

Summons

Original Summons filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders (Order signed 6/8/2021) filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by O Hara, Kyle. Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by O Hara, Kyle. Refers to: Carnitas Snack Shack I LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack III LLC; Carnitas Snack Shack II LLC; Chinois SD Inc Filed By: O Hara, Kyle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIVAK DAVID G.