This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/17/2020 at 01:23:57 (UTC).

NwTech, Inc. vs Lara

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 NwTech, Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Lara. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NwTech, Inc.

Defendant

Lara, Conrad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Watson II, Houston M

Defendant Attorney

Green, Sabrina L

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR SERVICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

Declaration of Harvey Brate

Declaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

DECLARATION OF HOUSTON M. WATSON II

Declaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

DECLARATION OF ALLAN WEBB

Declaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

DECLARATION OF STUART MASKELL

Declaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

DECLARATION OF ROBERT NEALON

Declaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc..

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/18/2019 08:30:00 AM.

Answer

Answer filed by Lara, Conrad.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Lara, Conrad.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad

Complaint

Complaint filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/18/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Order Shortening Time (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (12/18/2019) filed by NwTech, Inc.. Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Lara, Conrad. Filed By: Lara, Conrad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Lara, Conrad. Filed By: Lara, Conrad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/15/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by NwTech, Inc.. Refers to: Lara, Conrad Filed By: NwTech, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN SABRINA L.