This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 07:42:59 (UTC).

Nungaray vs Ballesteros

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Nungaray filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ballesteros. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nungaray III, Vicente

Nungaray, Rosa

Defendants

Ballesteros, Maria Magdalena

Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena

Guardian Ad Litem

Garcia, Jenny N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROY, RICHARD R

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD R ROY APC

2801 Camino Del Rio South Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

Coderre, Matthew

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED 10/14/2021) filed by Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Garcia, Jenny

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena

Complaint

Complaint filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ballesteros, Maria Magdalena; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ballesteros, Maria Magdalena; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena. Filed By: Ballesteros, Maria Magdalena (Defendant); Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED 10/14/2021) filed by Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Garcia, Jenny Filed By: Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nungaray, Rosa; Nungaray, Vicente III. Refers to: Ballesteros, Maria; Flores De Ballesteros, Lorena Filed By: Nungaray, Rosa (Plaintiff); Nungaray, Vicente III (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY, RICHARD R