This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 06:26:17 (UTC).

North Coast Surgery Center LTD vs. Pikor

Case Summary

On 08/15/2014 North Coast Surgery Center LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Pikor. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

North Coast Surgery Center LTD; DBA : North Coast Surgery Center 217

Defendant

Pikor, Dolores

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba, Rudy Jr

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution returned WHOLLY UNSATISFIED

Writ of Execution returned WHOLLY UNSATISFIED

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from N-26 to N-29 effective 11/15/2014.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (WITH DISMISSAL OF DOES 1-10) filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT) filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Abstract of Judgment issued.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Execution returned WHOLLY UNSATISFIED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2016
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Execution issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2016
View Court Documents

DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2015
View Court Documents

DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT) filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2015
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2015

DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for North Coast Surgery Center LTD and against Pikor, Dolores for $ 2748.60, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 687.15, interest: $ 646.50, prejudgment costs: $ 274.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 4356.25.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
12/16/2014
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCase reassigned from N-26 to N-29 effective 11/15/2014.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2014
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2014

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2014
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Venue filed by North Coast Surgery Center LTD. Refers to: Pikor, Dolores Filed By: North Coast Surgery Center LTD (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2014

DocketCase assigned to Department N-26.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less