This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:27:07 (UTC).

Nordic Hygge vs Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Nordic Hygge filed an Other lawsuit against Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Nordic Hygge

Jensen, Bo Kjaergaard

Jensen, Stine

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Reed, Rebecca L

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Brizolis, Alex G

Attorney at PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH LLP

525 B Street 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Park, Ernie Zachary

13215 E Penn Street Suite 510

Whittier, CA 90602

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nordic Hygge.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nordic Hygge; Nordic Hygge.

Hygge Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Nordic Hygge.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nordic Hygge.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/18/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories

Motion to Compel Discovery (to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories) filed by Nordic Hygge.

Separate Statement ISO MTC Further Responses to Form Irogs

Separate Statement filed by Nordic Hygge.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motions to Compel

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Nordic Hygge.

Declaration of Alex Brizolis ISO MTC Responses

Declaration - Other (of Alex Brizolis) filed by Nordic Hygge.

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Irogs

Motion to Compel Discovery (to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed by Nordic Hygge.

Separate Statement ISO MTC Further Responses to Special Irogs

Separate Statement filed by Nordic Hygge.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO MTC Further Responses

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Nordic Hygge.

Declaration of Brizolis ISO MTC Further Responses

Declaration - Other (of Alex Brizolis) filed by Nordic Hygge.

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Req for Production

Motion to Compel Discovery (to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production) filed by Nordic Hygge.

Separate Statement ISO MTC Further Responses to RFP

Separate Statement filed by Nordic Hygge.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO MTC Further Responses

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Nordic Hygge.

Declaration of Brizolis ISO MTC Further Responses

Declaration - Other (of Alex Brizolis) filed by Nordic Hygge.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Nordic Hygge. Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories) filed by Nordic Hygge. Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSeparate Statement filed by Nordic Hygge. Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Nordic Hygge. Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Alex Brizolis) filed by Nordic Hygge. Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nordic Hygge. Refers to: Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nordic Hygge. Refers to: Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nordic Hygge. Refers to: Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC Filed By: Nordic Hygge (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Del Mar Highlands Town Center Associates II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brizolis, Alex G

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED, REBECCA L