This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/13/2019 at 07:57:25 (UTC).

Nicolle D. Fedor vs. Howerton Property Management

Case Summary

On 08/01/2011 Nicolle D Fedor filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Howerton Property Management. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fedor, Nicolle D.

Defendant

Howerton Management Services Inc

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 10/21/2011 09:30:00 AM.

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Fedor, Nicolle D.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Nicolle D. Fedor and against Howerton Management Services Inc in the amount of: $173.00 principal, $30.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketMatter decided.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 10/21/2011 09:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketMatter taken under submission.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Fedor, Nicolle D.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Fedor, Nicolle D. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Plaintiff - Substitute filed by Fedor, Nicolle D.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Fedor, Nicolle D. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Fedor, Nicolle D.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Fedor, Nicolle D. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 10/21/2011 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 10/21/2011 at 09:30:00 AM in KM-1 before at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Fedor, Nicolle D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 09/13/2011 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in KM-1 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department KM-1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Fedor, Nicolle D.. Refers to: Howerton Management Services Inc Filed By: Fedor, Nicolle D. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less