Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/13/2020 at 02:26:15 (UTC).

Nguyen vs Luu

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Nguyen filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Luu. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Nguyen, Tuan

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Luu, Hong T; DBA : Saigon on Fifth

ZHOU, LIJUN ; AKA : ZHOU, LILY

Luu, Hong T

LXG Group Inc

Themedia Inc

Nguyen, Tuan

Dang, Mimi

Zheng, Jie Ying

Wang, Zhaixing ; AKA : Wang, James

Sanner, Michael F

Guardian Ad Litem

Dang, Tho H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Gallagher, Thomas

Attorney at GALLAGHER KIRCH APC

964 Fifth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Richter, Michael P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL P RICHTER

438 Camino Del Rio South 219

San Diego, CA 92108

Phillips, Frederick C

Pleasant, Joseph M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP

Nunez, Steven M

Attorney at SMN LAW GROUP APC

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Gallagher, Thomas

Attorney at GALLAGHER KIRCH APC

964 Fifth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Richter, Michael P

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL P RICHTER

438 Camino Del Rio South 219

San Diego, CA 92108

Phillips, Frederick C

Pleasant, Joseph M

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP

Nunez, Steven M

Attorney at SMN LAW GROUP APC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/09/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by LXG Group Inc; Zheng, Jie Ying.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS) filed by Nguyen, Tuan.

ANSWER AND GENERAL DENIAL

Answer filed by Nguyen, Tuan.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Nguyen, Tuan.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/13/2019 10:00:00 AM.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by ZHOU, LIJUN.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by LXG Group Inc.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe submitted by Luu, Hong T rejected on 07/10/2019.

Summons Amended Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (on First Amended Cross Complaint) filed by Luu, Hong T.

Amended Summons

Original Summons (on First Amended Complaint) filed by Nguyen, Tuan.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong; ZHOU, LIJUN; LXG Group Inc

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: ZHOU, LIJUN

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: ZHOU, LIJUN

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 8]

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by LXG Group Inc; Zheng, Jie Ying. Filed By: LXG Group Inc (Cross - Defendant); Zheng, Jie Ying (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Luu, Hong T. Filed By: Luu, Hong T (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 10/09/2020 at 10:00:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to stipulation to 06/05/2020 at 10:00AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/17/2020 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by LXG Group Inc. Filed By: LXG Group Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by LXG Group Inc. Filed By: LXG Group Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong; ZHOU, LIJUN; Luu, Hong Filed By: Nguyen, Tuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong Filed By: Nguyen, Tuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nguyen, Tuan. Refers to: Luu, Hong Filed By: Nguyen, Tuan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Richter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillips, Frederick C

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUNEZ STEVEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN M. REESE & ASSOCIATES - JOSEPH M. PLEASANT