Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 08:05:27 (UTC).

Nguyen vs Fuentes

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Nguyen filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Fuentes. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nguyen, Victoria

Respondents

Fuentes, Antonio

Fuentes, Nina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 01/02/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Refers to: Fuentes, Antonio Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to party's motion to 01/02/2020 at 08:30AM in Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 12/12/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Refers to: Tran, Chien; Fuentes, Nina; Fuentes, Antonio Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Refers to: Tran, Chien; Fuentes, Nina; Fuentes, Antonio Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing filed by Nguyen, Victoria. Filed By: Nguyen, Victoria (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketHearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-61 .

    Read MoreRead Less