This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:31:21 (UTC).

New Hope Healthcare, LLC vs CILING

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 New Hope Healthcare, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CILING. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari

Heikali, Moosa

New Hope Healthcare, LLC

Defendants

Ciling, Sammy

Nath Investment, Inc.

Sanath, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Safaie, Majid

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Nath Investment, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc.

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc.

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc.

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Nath Investment, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Sanath, Inc.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc.

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Nath Investment, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Sanath, Inc.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default was denied as to Ciling, Sammy on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default was denied as to Nath Investment, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default was denied as to Sanath, Inc. on Complaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (**NOT ENTERED**) filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Nath Investment, Inc. Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Sanath, Inc. Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC. Refers to: Nath Investment, Inc. Filed By: New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC. Refers to: Sanath, Inc. Filed By: New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Heikali, Moosa; New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Filed By: Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. Filed By: New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. Filed By: New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by New Hope Healthcare, LLC; Heikali, Moosa; Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari. Refers to: Ciling, Sammy; Nath Investment, Inc.; Sanath, Inc. Filed By: New Hope Healthcare, LLC (Plaintiff); Heikali, Moosa (Plaintiff); Firoozabadi, Seyedjalil Mirjafari (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANATH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAFAIE MAJID