This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/16/2020 at 01:58:14 (UTC).

Nevins vs. Rabii

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Nevins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rabii. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEVINS, CHRISTOPHER

Antelope, CA 95843

Defendant

RABII, MAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUCHANAN, RYAN

Attorney at THE MAY FIRM INC

297 Santa Rosa St

San Luis Obispo, CA 93405

Defendant Attorney

PATTON, CHRISTOPHER L

Attorney at MCDOWELL SHAW & GARCIA

3350 Shelby St Suite 380

Ontario, CA 91764

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/03/2020 01:30:00 PM.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order filed by Rabii, Max.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order filed by Rabii, Max.

Notice of Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel Discovery (11/1/19) filed by Rabii, Max.

Notice of Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Rabii, Max.

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Buchanan, Ryan.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/31/2019 01:30:00 PM.

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (05/31/2019) filed by Nevins, Christopher.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/29/2019 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nevins, Christopher.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rabii, Max.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nevins, Christopher. Refers to: Rabii, Max

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Nevins, Christopher. Refers to: Rabii, Max

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 02/14/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/17/2020 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Appear SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/09/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 01/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (1/9) filed by Rabii, Max. Filed By: Rabii, Max (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/03/2020 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Nevins, Christopher. Filed By: Nevins, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Rabii, Max. Filed By: Rabii, Max (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Rabii, Max. Filed By: Rabii, Max (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nevins, Christopher. Refers to: Rabii, Max Filed By: Nevins, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nevins, Christopher. Refers to: Rabii, Max Filed By: Nevins, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nevins, Christopher. Refers to: Rabii, Max Filed By: Nevins, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATTON CHRISTOPHER LYNN