Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 03:38:12 (UTC).

Nelson vs Sandoval

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Nelson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Sandoval. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nelson, Richard

Defendants

Sandoval, Maria Antoinette

Sandoval, Antoinette Christina

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell, Timothy

Attorney at KARNS & KARNS LLP

Defendant Attorney

Jackson, Blaise J

Attorney at BONNIE R MOSS & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Sandoval, Antoinette Christina; Sandoval, Maria Antoinette.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Nelson, Richard.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Maria

Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered as to Maria Sandoval

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Entry of Default - Not Entered as to Antoinette Sandoval

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Sandoval, Maria

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 20]

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Sandoval, Maria

d2

[Another document for ROA# 25]

d1

[Another document for ROA# 25]

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette

Complaint

Complaint filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette; Sandoval, Maria

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette; Sandoval, Maria

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Sandoval, Maria Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 25]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 25]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Sandoval, Antoinette Christina; Sandoval, Maria Antoinette. Filed By: Sandoval, Antoinette Christina (Defendant); Sandoval, Maria Antoinette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Sandoval, Antoinette Christina; Sandoval, Maria Antoinette. Filed By: Sandoval, Antoinette Christina (Defendant); Sandoval, Maria Antoinette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclosure of Relationship filed by Sandoval, Antoinette Christina; Sandoval, Maria Antoinette. Filed By: Sandoval, Antoinette Christina (Defendant); Sandoval, Maria Antoinette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Sandoval, Antoinette Christina; Sandoval, Maria Antoinette. Filed By: Sandoval, Antoinette Christina (Defendant); Sandoval, Maria Antoinette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Maria Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette; Sandoval, Maria Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette; Sandoval, Maria Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nelson, Richard. Refers to: Sandoval, Antoinette; Sandoval, Maria Filed By: Nelson, Richard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/30/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jackson, Blaise J