This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 18:18:14 (UTC).

NEITZEL vs. CARTER

Case Summary

On 06/11/2014 NEITZEL filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CARTER. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT P DAHLQUIST. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NEITZEL, DAVID

NEITZEL, ERICKA

THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CARTER, DAWN MACLEOD

CARTER, RANDY

CUSTER, JONATHAN

MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY

LAWYER TITLE COMPANY

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NEITZEL, DAVID

NEITZEL, ERICKA

THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC

CARTER, DAWN MACLEOD

CARTER, RANDY

MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Mazza, Megan A

Attorney at GRESHAM SAVAGE NOLAN & TILDEN

550 W C Street 1810

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

SULLIVAN, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at CALLAHAN LITTLE & SULLIVAN

110 Juniper St

San Diego, CA 92101

WANG, JACKY P

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

915 Wilshire Blvd #2100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (of Change of Attorney Address) filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CUSTER, JONATHAN

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (12/19/14) filed by CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN MACLEOD; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN MACLEOD; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (2/20/15) filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC.

Correspondence

Correspondence (CORRESPONDENCE DATED 12/29/14 BY RANDY CARTER) filed by CARTER, RANDY.

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by MEAGAN'S RUN LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (8/28/15) filed by LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY.

Order - Other

Order - Other (8/28/15) submitted by LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY received but not filed on 06/12/2015.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY. Refers to: MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC; NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA. Refers to: LAWYER TITLE COMPANY

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 10/02/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC; NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA. Refers to: CARTER, DAWN; CARTER, RANDY; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC; NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA. Refers to: CARTER, DAWN; CARTER, RANDY; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY.

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • Notice - Other (of Change of Attorney Address) filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CUSTER, JONATHAN Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Change of Attorney Address) filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY. Filed By: LAWYER TITLE COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court (ON CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC Filed By: LAWYER TITLE COMPANY (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (CROSS-COMPLAINANT LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY'S BRIEF SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) filed by LAWYER TITLE COMPANY. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC Filed By: LAWYER TITLE COMPANY (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 03/04/2016 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • The Court enters judgment on the Cross-Complaint for LAWYER TITLE COMPANY, NAMEONCASE LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY and against RANDY CARTER, DAWN MACLEOD CARTER, MEAGAN'S RUN LLC in the amount of: $35000.00 principal, $0 punitive damages, $0 attorney fees, $0 interest, $435.00 prejudgment costs and $0 other costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 03/04/2016 at 11:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (of ROES 1 through 20) filed by LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY. Filed By: LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CARTER, DAWN Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/02/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC; CUSTER, JONATHAN; LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • [A document for ROA# 3]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC; CUSTER, JONATHAN; LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by NEITZEL, DAVID; NEITZEL, ERICKA; THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC. Refers to: CARTER, RANDY; CARTER, DAWN; MEAGAN'S RUN LLC; CUSTER, JONATHAN; LAWYERS TITLE COMPANY Filed By: NEITZEL, DAVID (Plaintiff); NEITZEL, ERICKA (Plaintiff); THOMAS PARIS DEVELOPMENT LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.