This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/12/2022 at 08:10:36 (UTC).

Nehez vs Yuma Regional Medical Center

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Nehez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Yuma Regional Medical Center. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nehez, Jessica

Defendant

Yuma Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teed, Cory M

3130 Bonita Road 200

Chula Vista, CA 91910

Defendant Attorney

Chow, Teresa C.

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center

Specially Appearing Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pursuant to Cal. Code. Civ. Proc. Section 418.10; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.

Declaration of Teresa C. Chow

Declaration - Other (OF TERESA C. CHOW) filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.

Declaration of Lori Nolte

Declaration - Other (of Lori Nolte) filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Quash Service of Summons

Proposed Order submitted by Yuma Regional Medical Center received but not filed on 08/25/2022.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Motion to Quash (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order submitted by Yuma Regional Medical Center received but not filed on 08/25/2022.; Filed By: Yuma Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Lori Nolte) filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.; Filed By: Yuma Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (OF TERESA C. CHOW) filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.; Filed By: Yuma Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons filed by Yuma Regional Medical Center.; Filed By: Yuma Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMotion to Quash (Civil) scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center; Filed By: Nehez, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center; Filed By: Nehez, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center; Filed By: Nehez, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nehez, Jessica. Refers to: Yuma Regional Medical Center; Filed By: Nehez, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yuma Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHOW TERESA C.