This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:48:48 (UTC).

Navy Federal Credit Union vs Williams

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Navy Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Navy Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Williams, Duane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stelmach, Morani

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service of Non-Case Initiating Document filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Filed By: Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2020 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane Filed By: Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane Filed By: Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane Filed By: Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Navy Federal Credit Union. Refers to: Williams, Duane Filed By: Navy Federal Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.