This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/31/2022 at 07:05:28 (UTC).

NAVARRO vs RIVERA

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 NAVARRO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RIVERA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Navarro, Dennis

Navarro, Elizier

Defendant

RIVERA, LUZ MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Jorge C

Attorney at GONZALEZ & GARCIA APC

715 3Rd Ave

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ

Complaint

Complaint filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Navarro, Dennis; Navarro, Elizier.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Navarro, Dennis; Navarro, Elizier. Filed By: Navarro, Dennis (Plaintiff); Navarro, Elizier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to RIVERA, LUZ MARIA .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Navarro, Elizier .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Navarro, Dennis .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ Filed By: Navarro, Elizier (Plaintiff); Navarro, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ Filed By: Navarro, Elizier (Plaintiff); Navarro, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Navarro, Elizier; Navarro, Dennis. Refers to: RIVERA, LUZ Filed By: Navarro, Elizier (Plaintiff); Navarro, Dennis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ JORGE CARLOS