This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 08:36:33 (UTC).

Nationwide Insurance Company of America vs EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 Nationwide Insurance Company of America filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDCO Waste Recycling Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationwide Insurance Company of America

Defendant

EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benson, Susan M

8550 Balboa Boulevard 290

Northridge, CA 91325

Defendant Attorney

Chilcoat, Jill S.

Attorney at LINCOLN GUSTAFSON & CERCOS LLP

550 West C Street 1400

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

[A document for ROA# 2]

Complaint (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Defendant EDCO Waste and Recycling Services, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc. Filed By: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc Filed By: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc Filed By: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc Filed By: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Refers to: EDCO Waste & Recycling Services Inc Filed By: Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDCO WASTE & RECYCLING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationwide Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M