This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/24/2020 at 04:37:14 (UTC).

Naish vs Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Naish filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Naish, Paul

Naish, Paula

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIRMINGHAM, MARK A

Sigelman, Kenneth M.

Attorney at SIGELMAN & ASSOCIATES

Chivinski, Andrew R

Attorney at KENNETH M SIGELMAN & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Complaint

Complaint filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Proof of Service of Summons - SCPMG

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Southern California Permanente Medical Group

Proof of Service of Summons - KFHP, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Proof of Service of Summons - KFH

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Naish, Paul; Naish, Paula. Refers to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals; Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; Southern California Permanente Medical Group Filed By: Naish, Paul (Plaintiff); Naish, Paula (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGELMAN KENNETH