This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 03:44:42 (UTC).

MYXOLIDIAN LLC vs. STANTON

Case Summary

On 03/05/2014 MYXOLIDIAN LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STANTON. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EARL H. MAAS, III. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EARL H. MAAS, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYXOLIDIAN LLC

Defendants

BUCHHEIT, PAUL

DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST

DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST

GALLAHER, MATTHEW J

JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST

KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST

LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST

ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST

RUSSELL, RICHARD

STANTON, DAVID BRYAN

THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC

Clarke, Walter J

David, Stanton Bryan

OXFORD INVESTMENT PARTNERS LLC

ROSENFELD, JOHN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirby, Dean Thompson Jr

Attorney at KIRBY & MCGUINN APC

1100, 707 Broadway

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

FRENCH, JENNIFER M

Attorney at THE LEVENTHAL LAW FIRM APC

600 West Broadway Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (RICHARD RUSSELL) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: RUSSELL, RICHARD

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling (on Defendants Ex Parte Application to Stay Proceedings) filed by David, Stanton Bryan; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW J; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD;OTHERS.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (VACATE ORDER STAYING CASE) filed by Clarke, Walter J.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/09/2014 08:30:00 AM.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (3rd, 4th, 5th COA) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: BUCHHEIT, PAUL

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/20 MTN TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (and Worksheet) filed by Clarke, Walter J.

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2014
  • Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 10:15:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by Clarke, Walter J rejected on 10/22/2014. Filed By: Clarke, Walter J (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to MYXOLIDIAN LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to David, Stanton Bryan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Clarke, Walter J .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Oxford Investment Partners LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Rosenfeld, John D .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: Rosenfeld, John; Oxford Investment Partners LLC; Clarke, Walter; David, Stanton; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC Filed By: MYXOLIDIAN LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by BUCHHEIT, PAUL; Clarke, Walter J; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; David, Stanton Bryan; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; GALLAHER, MATTHEW J; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; Oxford Investment Partners LLC;OTHERS. Filed By: BUCHHEIT, PAUL (Defendant); Clarke, Walter J (Defendant); DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST (Defendant); David, Stanton Bryan (Defendant); DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2014
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/08/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Motion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 08/08/2014 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC; Clarke, Walter; Rosenfeld, John; Oxford Investment Partners LLC; David, Stanton Filed By: MYXOLIDIAN LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC Filed By: MYXOLIDIAN LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC Filed By: MYXOLIDIAN LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by MYXOLIDIAN LLC. Refers to: STANTON, DAVID; DAVID BRYAN STANTON AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID BRYAN STANTON REVOCABLE TRUST; JANE A BARTELME TRUSTEE OF THE JANE A BARTELME TRUST; BUCHHEIT, PAUL; GALLAHER, MATTHEW; LEAH L LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE LEAH L LEWIS TRUST; DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUSTEE OF THE DELANA JEAN LEWIS TRUST; ROBERT K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; KATALIN K RADER TRUSTEE OF THE RADER FAMILY TRUST; RUSSELL, RICHARD; THERMOGEN HOLDINGS LLC Filed By: MYXOLIDIAN LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.