This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 08:02:35 (UTC).

Myslak vs 3M COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Myslak filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline M. Stern and Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacqueline M. Stern

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myslak, Andrew

Defendants

Dupont de nemours inc

Dynax Corporation

Kidde Fire Fire Fighting Inc

3M Company; FKA : Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co

Buckeye Fire Equipment Co

National Foam Inc

The Chemours Company FC LLC

EI Dupont De Nemours & Co

Kidde PLC Inc Kidde Fenwall Inc

UTC Fire & SecurityAmericas Inc

The Chemours Co

Chemguard Inc

Tyco Fire Products LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAFER, JEREMY C

 

Court Documents

Original Summons

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Myslak, Andrew. Refers to: 3M Company; National Foam Inc; Kidde Fire Fire Fighting Inc; Kidde PLC Inc Kidde Fenwall Inc; Tyco Fire Products LP; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co; Chemguard Inc; Dynax Corporation; UTC Fire & SecurityAmericas Inc; EI Dupont De Nemours & Co; The Chemours Co; The Chemours Company FC LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Myslak, Andrew. Refers to: 3M Company; National Foam Inc; Kidde Fire Fire Fighting Inc; Kidde PLC Inc Kidde Fenwall Inc; Tyco Fire Products LP; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co; Chemguard Inc; Dynax Corporation; UTC Fire & SecurityAmericas Inc; EI Dupont De Nemours & Co; The Chemours Co; The Chemours Company FC LLC; Dupont de nemours inc

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Stays)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL) filed by 3M Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL) filed by 3M Company. Filed By: 3M Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freeland, Cynthia for 05/07/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to Freeland,Cynthia effective 11/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Myslak, Andrew. Refers to: 3M Company; National Foam Inc; Kidde Fire Fire Fighting Inc; Kidde PLC Inc Kidde Fenwall Inc; Tyco Fire Products LP; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co; Chemguard Inc; Dynax Corporation; UTC Fire & SecurityAmericas Inc; EI Dupont De Nemours & Co; The Chemours Co; The Chemours Company FC LLC; Dupont de nemours inc Filed By: Myslak, Andrew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Myslak, Andrew. Refers to: 3M Company; National Foam Inc; Kidde Fire Fire Fighting Inc; Kidde PLC Inc Kidde Fenwall Inc; Tyco Fire Products LP; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co; Chemguard Inc; Dynax Corporation; UTC Fire & SecurityAmericas Inc; EI Dupont De Nemours & Co; The Chemours Co; The Chemours Company FC LLC Filed By: Myslak, Andrew (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EI DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Dupont De Nemours Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Dynax Corporation is a litigant