This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 16:24:26 (UTC).

Munoz vs. Recontruct Company NA

Case Summary

On 06/28/2012 Munoz filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Recontruct Company NA. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-EC

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gomez, Guadalupe

Munoz, Rene

Defendants

Bank of America NA

Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc

Recontruct Company NA

The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; FKA : The Bank of New York as Trustee of Countrywide Altern

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION; FKA : THE BANK OF NEW YORK AS TRUSTEE OF COUNTRYWIDE ALTERNATIVE LOAN TRUST 2005-76

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren, Genille

Attorney at ARYA LAW CENTER P C

3187 Red Hill Ave #110

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorney

FOX, TIMOTHY S

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

1500 Michelson Dr

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc

Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION) filed by Bank of America NA.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. Wrongful Foreclosure; 2. Fraud; 3. Slander; 4. Violation of CC Section 2932.5; 5. Violation of BP 17200 et seq.) filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc

Demurrer

Demurrer (Notice and Other Supporting Documents) filed by Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc. Refers to: Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc. Refers to: Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe

Notice of Unconditional Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc; Recontruct Company NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Bank of America NA; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc; Recontruct Company NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/15/2013 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2013 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc. Refers to: Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe Filed By: Recontruct Company NA (Defendant); Bank of America NA (Defendant); The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation (Defendant); Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 12/07/2012 at 11:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Munoz, Rene; Gomez, Guadalupe. Refers to: Recontruct Company NA; Bank of America NA; The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc Filed By: Munoz, Rene (Plaintiff); Gomez, Guadalupe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.