This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/19/2022 at 07:17:37 (UTC).

Mullins vs CGI FEDERAL INC

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 Mullins filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CGI FEDERAL INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mullins, Amed

Defendant

CGI FEDERAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barari, Neama Cory

Attorney at CASKEY & HOLZMAN

24025 Park Sorrento Street 400

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorney

GI, GINA

Attorney at SEYFARTH SHAW LLP

601 S Figueroa Street 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.; Filed By: CGI FEDERAL INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC; Filed By: Mullins, Amed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/21/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC; Filed By: Mullins, Amed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC; Filed By: Mullins, Amed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mullins, Amed. Refers to: CGI FEDERAL INC; Filed By: Mullins, Amed (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less