This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 02:31:59 (UTC).

Mudek vs Zero Motorcycles Inc

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 Mudek filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Zero Motorcycles Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mudek, Mario

Defendants

Moto Forza

Zero Motorcycles Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, NORMAN F

Attorney at NORMAN TAYLOR & ASSOCIATES

425 West Broadway Ste 220

Glendale, CA 91204

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Moto Forza

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Moto Forza; Filed By: Mudek, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Filed By: Mudek, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza; Filed By: Mudek, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza; Filed By: Mudek, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Mudek, Mario. Refers to: Zero Motorcycles Inc; Moto Forza; Filed By: Mudek, Mario (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zero Motorcycles, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR NORMAN F.