This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 10:33:03 (UTC).

Moussavian vs State Farm General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Moussavian filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm General Insurance Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

State Farm General Insurance Company

Moussavian, Dr. Mehran

Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc

City of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Nunn, Randall M

Attorney at HUGHES & NUNN LLP

LETOFSKY, BRIAN S

Attorney at WATKINS & LETOFSKY LLP

CLOSSON, ROBERT V

Attorney at HIRSCH CLOSSON APLC

Goodman, Jenny K

Attorney at DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

BEEKMAN, LYNN M

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; State Farm General Insurance Company.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 04/09/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 23]

Original Summons

[A document for ROA# 24]

Defendant DeRenzis Insurance Agency, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc.

Stipulation to Consolidate

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to Consolidate Related Actions for Pre Trial Purposes) filed by City of San Diego; State Farm General Insurance Company; Moussavian, Dr. Mehran; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by City of San Diego.

City of San Diego's Memorandum of Ps & As ISO Demurrer to State Farm Gen Ins Co. Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of San Diego.

Declaration of Lynn M. Beekman ISO Demurrer

Declaration - Other (Of Lynn M Beekman) filed by City of San Diego.

City of San Diego's Proof of Service re Demurrer

Proof of Service filed by City of San Diego.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt re State Farm

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal, City of SD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran. Refers to: City of San Diego

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Richard Whitney effective 02/03/2020

Complaint For Breach of Contract; Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; Reformation; Declaratory Relief; Negligence; Private Nuisance; Inverse Condemnation, etc.

Complaint filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; City of San Diego

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Moussavian, Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; City of San Diego

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc (Defendant); State Farm General Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by State Farm General Insurance Company. Refers to: City of San Diego Filed By: State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Of Lynn M Beekman) filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Richard Whitney effective 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran. Filed By: Moussavian, Dr. Mehran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Moussavian, Dr. Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: Moussavian, Dr. Mehran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Moussavian, Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: Moussavian, Mehran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Moussavian, Mehran. Refers to: State Farm General Insurance Company; Derenzis Insurance Agency Inc; City of San Diego Filed By: Moussavian, Mehran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLOSSON, ROBERT V

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nunn, Randall M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETOFSKY BRIAN SAMUEL