This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 01:14:24 (UTC).

Mountain Acquisitions Inc vs. Damasco

Case Summary

On 08/29/2012 Mountain Acquisitions Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Damasco. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mountain Acquisitions Inc

Defendant

Damasco, Evelyn F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carruthers, D Scott

Attorney at A PROFESSION LAW CORPORATION

8448 Katella Ave

Stanton, CA 90680

 

Court Documents

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees

Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-10) filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Mountain Acquisitions Inc rejected on 10/25/2012. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution issued.

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • ****WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Mountain Acquisitions Inc and against Damasco, Evelyn F for $ 4700.19, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 825.00, interest: $ 6345.50, prejudgment costs: $ 246.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 12116.69.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Mountain Acquisitions Inc rejected on 10/25/2012. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • Default entered as to Damasco, Evelyn F on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1-10) filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • COURT judgment rec'd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by Mountain Acquisitions Inc. Refers to: Damasco, Evelyn Filed By: Mountain Acquisitions Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.