This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 22:52:42 (UTC).

Motion Recruitment Partners Inc vs Events.com Inc

Case Summary

On 09/30/2015 Motion Recruitment Partners Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Events com Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH F. HAYES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH F. HAYES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Motion Recruitment Partners Inc; DBA : Workbridge Associates

Defendant

Events.com Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARSONS, CHRISTOPHER G

34437 Via Verde

Dana Point, CA 92624

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Motion Recruitment Partners Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Events.com Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc Filed By: Motion Recruitment Partners Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • [Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2016 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc Filed By: Motion Recruitment Partners Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Motion Recruitment Partners Inc. Refers to: Events.com Inc Filed By: Motion Recruitment Partners Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Events.com Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARSONS CHRISTOPHER G. LAW OFFICES OF