This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 15:07:09 (UTC).

Mota vs. Tri-City Healthcare District

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by Mota against Tri-City Healthcare District in the jurisdiction of San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOTA, DELPHINA

IHEANACHOR, PAUL

MOTA, DELFINA

Defendants

LOPEZ M D, SANDRA

SANDRA LOPEZ M D INC

DAVID SEIF M D INC

TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

SEIF M D, DAVID

TRI-CITY MEDICAL CENTER

TRI-CITY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT; DBA : TRI-CITY MEDICAL CENTER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: David Seif M D Inc

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (DOE 16 AND DOE 17) filed by Mota, Delfina. Refers to: Anesthesia Services Medical Group; Anesthesia Services Medical Group Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Lopez M D, Sandra

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Tri-City Healthcare District.

Declaration in support of Demurrer

Declaration - Other (8/2/19) filed by Anesthesia Services Medical Inc; Seif M D, David.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Trial Counsel) filed by Tri-City Healthcare District.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Seif M D, David; Anesthesia Services Medical Inc.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (**1st AMENDED COMPLAINT**) filed by Mota, Delfina; Iheanachor, Paul; SALAZAR, CORRINA. Refers to: Tri-City Healthcare District; Lopez M D, Sandra; VISTA COMMUNITY CLINIC; Seif M D, David; Anesthesia Services Medical Group

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Sandra Lopez M D Inc

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Demurrer

[Another document for ROA# 54]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer

Demurrer (8/2/19) filed by Anesthesia Services Medical Inc; Seif M D, David.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Request - Other (STIPULATION CLARIFYING CLAIMS IN FAC REJECTED) submitted by Mota, Delfina rejected on 10/11/2018.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Request for Jury Trial

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Anesthesia Services Medical Inc; Seif M D, David.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (12/14/18-POS OF CMC STATEMENT) filed by Mota, Delfina.

Declaration in support of Demurrer

[Another document for ROA# 54]

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/27/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by United States of America. Filed By: United States of America (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint filed by Mota, Delfina; Iheanachor, Paul; SALAZAR, CORRINA. Refers to: United States of America Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff); SALAZAR, CORRINA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Anesthesia Services Medical Inc; Seif M D, David. Filed By: Anesthesia Services Medical Inc (Defendant); Seif M D, David (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/31/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike continued pursuant to party's motion to 09/27/2019 at 01:30PM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to stipulation to 09/13/2019 at 09:00AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: David Seif M D Inc Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Seif M D, David Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/14/2018 at 09:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Tri-City Healthcare District; Tri-City Medical Center; Lopez M D, Sandra; Sandra Lopez M D Inc; Seif M D, David; David Seif M D Inc Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Tri-City Healthcare District; Tri-City Medical Center; Lopez M D, Sandra; Sandra Lopez M D Inc; Seif M D, David; David Seif M D Inc Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Mota, Delphina; Iheanachor, Paul. Refers to: Tri-City Healthcare District; Tri-City Medical Center; Lopez M D, Sandra; Sandra Lopez M D Inc; Seif M D, David; David Seif M D Inc; Anesthesia Services Medical Inc; Anesthesia Services Medical Group Inc Filed By: Mota, Delfina (Plaintiff); Iheanachor, Paul (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.