This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:47:07 (UTC).

Morlet vs. BCNP LLC

Case Summary

On 02/03/2015 Morlet filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BCNP LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOAN M. LEWIS and GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOAN M. LEWIS

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Morlet, Dinah

Morlet, Jerome

Morlet, John-Paul

Morlet, Renee

Morlet, Roy

MORLET, RENE

MORLET, JOHN-PAUL ; AKA : MORLET, JEAN-PAUL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BCNP LLC; DBA : San Diego Removal Specialist

SCI California Funeral Services Inc; DBA : National City-Chula Vista Mortuary & Cremation Servic

SCI CALIFORNIA FUNERAL SERVICES INC; DBA : NATIONAL CITY-CHULA VISTA MORTUARY & CREMATION SERVICE

KRYNICKI, THOMAS

THOMAS KRYNICKI INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SAM IL INSURANCE GROUP, INC., A CALIORNIA CORPORATION

KRYNICKI, THOMAS

UNITED STATES LIABILITY GROUP, INC., A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION

THOMAS KRYNICKI INSURANCE AGENCY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AHN, STEPHEN M.

UNITED STATES LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE INC; ESA : FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Black, Jason N

Attorney at BLACK DEEN LLP

1620 Fifth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RAMEY, CHRISTOPHER L

3838 Camino Del Rio N

San Diego, CA 92108

GURNEE, STEVEN H

Attorney at GUNREE MASON & FORESTIERE LLP

2240 Douglas Boulevard 150

Roseville, CA 95661-3875

VAN DE GRIFT, JON H

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

1230 Columbia Street Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

VAN DE GRIFT, JON H

Attorney at SKANE WILCOX LLP

1230 Columbia Street Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

VANDEN HEUVEL, TIM J

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

701 B Street 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

DOLMAGE, BRIEANNA MARIE

2601 Main Street 1300

Irvine, CA 92614

HOLLINS, ANDREW S

Attorney at HOLLINS LAW

2601 Main St Penthouse Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 92614-4239

RING, DAVID ALLEN

Attorney at DEMLER ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND

4500 E Pacific Coast Highway 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90804

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange Inc.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/12/2016 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Of declarations In Support Of Good Faith Settlement Appliction) filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Rene; Morlet, Jerome.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (to continue Trial and related Dates) filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Renee; Morlet, Jerome.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Ahn, Stephen M..

Reply to Opposition - Other

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Thomas Krynicki Insurance Agency, Inc., a California corporation.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP INC) filed by Morlet, Dinah. Refers to: Farmers Insurance Exchange Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (SAM IL INSURANCE GROUP INC) filed by Morlet, Dinah. Refers to: Sam Il Insurance Group, Inc., a Caliornia corporation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Thomas Krynicki Insurance Agency, Inc., a California corporation.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Lewis, Joan M. to Gregory Pollack effective 10/04/2016

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc; BCNP LLC.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc; BCNP LLC.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Christopher L. Ramey) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc; BCNP LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Ahn, Stephen M..

Complaint

Complaint filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Roy; Morlet, Jerome; Morlet, Renee. Refers to: BCNP LLC; SCI California Funeral Services Inc

Answer

Answer filed by United States Liability Insurance Company.

Demurrer

Notice - Other (of Demurrer) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc; BCNP LLC.

136 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc. Filed By: SCI California Funeral Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc. Filed By: SCI California Funeral Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Krynicki, Thomas; Thomas Krynicki Insurance Agency, Inc., a California corporation. Filed By: Krynicki, Thomas (Cross - Complainant); Thomas Krynicki Insurance Agency, Inc., a California corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 10/20/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2017 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc. Filed By: SCI California Funeral Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to United States Liability Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Thomas Krynicki Insurance Agency, Inc., a California corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Sam Il Insurance Group, Inc., a Caliornia corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
217 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Demurrer) filed by SCI California Funeral Services Inc; BCNP LLC. Filed By: SCI California Funeral Services Inc (Defendant); BCNP LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/25/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/25/2015 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2015 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Roy; Morlet, Jerome; Morlet, Renee. Refers to: BCNP LLC; SCI California Funeral Services Inc Filed By: Morlet, Dinah (Plaintiff); Morlet, John-Paul (Plaintiff); Morlet, Roy (Plaintiff); Morlet, Jerome (Plaintiff); Morlet, Rene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Roy; Morlet, Jerome; Morlet, Renee. Refers to: BCNP LLC; SCI California Funeral Services Inc Filed By: Morlet, Dinah (Plaintiff); Morlet, John-Paul (Plaintiff); Morlet, Roy (Plaintiff); Morlet, Jerome (Plaintiff); Morlet, Rene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Morlet, Dinah; Morlet, John-Paul; Morlet, Roy; Morlet, Jerome; Morlet, Renee. Refers to: BCNP LLC; SCI California Funeral Services Inc Filed By: Morlet, Dinah (Plaintiff); Morlet, John-Paul (Plaintiff); Morlet, Roy (Plaintiff); Morlet, Jerome (Plaintiff); Morlet, Rene (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.