This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 08:07:48 (UTC).

MORGAN vs VAZQUEZJAIME

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 MORGAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VAZQUEZJAIME. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORGAN, AARON

Defendants

The City of El Cajon

Vazquezjaime, Gilberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

600 B Suite 1450 Street

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Mitchell, Carrie L

8100 La Mesa Boulevard 200

La Mesa, CA 91942

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by MORGAN, AARON.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon.; Filed By: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto (Defendant); The City of El Cajon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by MORGAN, AARON.; Filed By: MORGAN, AARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon; Filed By: MORGAN, AARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon; Filed By: MORGAN, AARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon; Filed By: MORGAN, AARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by MORGAN, AARON. Refers to: Vazquezjaime, Gilberto; The City of El Cajon; Filed By: MORGAN, AARON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL CARRIE LYNN