Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 12:55:10 (UTC).

Morelli vs Arroya Jr

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Morelli filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Arroya Jr. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morelli, Frank

Defendants

Arroyo Jr, Norberto

Arroyo Sr, Norberto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EARLE, MICHAEL C

Bouzane, John E

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney filed by Morelli, Frank.

Substitution of Attorney filed by Morelli, Frank.

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Morelli, Frank.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Morelli, Frank.

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Morelli, Frank.

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Norberto Arroyo Jr) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto

Proof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Norberto Arroyo Sr) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Writ of Execution

Writ of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Morelli, Frank received but not filed on 02/14/2020. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied

Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Morelli, Frank.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment entered for Morelli, Frank and against Arroyo, Norberto Jr;Arroyo, Norberto Sr for a grand total of $ 1835.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Morelli, Frank. Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does filed by Morelli, Frank. Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment filed by Morelli, Frank. Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Morelli, Frank. Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketJudgment entered for Morelli, Frank and against Arroyo, Norberto Jr;Arroyo, Norberto Sr for a grand total of $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Unknown Occupants Included) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Norberto Arroyo Sr) filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution for Possession of the Premises submitted by Morelli, Frank received but not filed on 02/14/2020. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Arroyo, Norberto Jr on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Morelli, Frank .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Arroyo, Norberto Sr on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Morelli, Frank .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Morelli, Frank. Refers to: Arroyo, Norberto; Arroyo, Norberto Filed By: Morelli, Frank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUZANE JOHN E. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EARLE M.C.