Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 08:20:12 (UTC).

Morelatto vs Palmer

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Morelatto filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Palmer. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morelatto, Filipe

Defendants

Palmer, Paul

The Estate of Paul Palmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marjiya, Bassam

Attorney at MARJIYA LAW OFFICE PC

Defendant Attorney

Farmer, John T

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT PAUL PALMER, BY AND THROUGH THE ESTATE OF PAUL PALMER, ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MORELATTOS COMPLAINT (MOTOR VEHICLE AND GENERAL NEGLIGENCE)

Answer filed by Palmer, Paul.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: The Estate of Paul Palmer

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul; The Estate of Paul Palmer

Complaint

Complaint filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Morelatto, Filipe.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-65; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Palmer, Paul. Filed By: Palmer, Paul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul; The Estate of Paul Palmer Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: The Estate of Paul Palmer Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul; The Estate of Paul Palmer Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Refers to: Palmer, Paul Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Morelatto, Filipe. Filed By: Morelatto, Filipe (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARJIYA, BASSAM