This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/14/2022 at 01:37:55 (UTC).

Morales Baez vs Michels Pacific Energy Inc

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Morales Baez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michels Pacific Energy Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bustillos, Ibbel

Flynn, Kathleen

Morales Baez, Neftali

Defendants

Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.

Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.

SEMPRA ENERGY

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leisorek, Allen

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Joseph, James

600 B Suite 1450 Street

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 9]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Michaels Pacific Energy

Proof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen.

SDGE

Proof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.

Michaels Energy Holding

Proof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.

SEMPRA POS

Proof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen; Flynn, Kathleen.; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen.; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Morales Baez, Neftali; Bustillos, Ibbel; Flynn, Kathleen. Refers to: Michels Pacific Energy, Inc.; Michels Energy Holdings, Inc.; San Diego Gas & Electric Company; SEMPRA ENERGY; Filed By: Morales Baez, Neftali (Plaintiff); Bustillos, Ibbel (Plaintiff); Flynn, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph, James