This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 02:11:57 (UTC).

Montenegro vs Scripps Health

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 Montenegro filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Scripps Health. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Montenegro, Nora

Defendant

Scripps Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anderson, William Geoffrey

Attorney at SULLIVAN & YAECKEL LAW GROUP APC

2330 Third Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Karanjia, Freyaan Y.

Attorney at AMES KARANJIA LLP

2535 Truxtun Road Suite 206

San Diego, CA 92106

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Summons

Original Summons filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health

Complaint

Complaint filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Scripps Health.

Declaration of Freyaan Karanjia

Declaration - Other (of Freyaan Karanjia) filed by Scripps Health.

Defendant Scripps Health's Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Scripps Health.

Defendant Scripps Health's Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Scripps Health.

Defendant Scripps Health's Notice of Special Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Scripps Health.

Declaration in Support

Declaration - Other (in Support of Request for Dismissal) filed by Montenegro, Nora.

Request for Dismissal

Request - Other (and Order for Dismissal of Action) filed by Montenegro, Nora.

Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendant Scripps Health's Special Demurrer to Plaintiff's Representative Complaint and Request for Dismissal of Representative Action

Notice - Other (Notice of Non Opposition to Special Demurrer) filed by Scripps Health.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Scripps Health.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Montenegro, Nora .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Non Opposition to Special Demurrer) filed by Scripps Health. Filed By: Scripps Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (and Order for Dismissal of Action) filed by Montenegro, Nora. Filed By: Montenegro, Nora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (in Support of Request for Dismissal) filed by Montenegro, Nora. Filed By: Montenegro, Nora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/28/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 04/28/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Freyaan Karanjia) filed by Scripps Health. Filed By: Scripps Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Scripps Health. Filed By: Scripps Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health Filed By: Montenegro, Nora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health Filed By: Montenegro, Nora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Montenegro, Nora. Refers to: Scripps Health Filed By: Montenegro, Nora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scripps Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, William Geoffrey