This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 18:31:56 (UTC).

Monte D Mattson vs Speedway Constructors Inc

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 Monte D Mattson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Speedway Constructors Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOAN M. LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOAN M. LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MATTSON, MONTE D

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FORERO, WILLIAM

SPEEDWAY CONSTRUCTORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NICHOLAS, CRAIG M

WELLS, LACY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RUPE, RYAN G

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Mattson, Monte D; Mattson, Monte D.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Monte D. Mattson Answer to Amended Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Mattson, Monte D; Mattson, Monte D.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William.

Speedway Constructors, Inc.'s and William Forero's First Amended Cross-Complaint Against Monte D. Mattson

Amended Cross-Complaint (1st) filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William. Refers to: Mattson, Monte

Amended Summons on Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (Amended Cross Complaint) filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William. Refers to: Mattson, Monte

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William.

Speedway Constructors, Inc. and William Forero's Cross-Complaint Against Monte D. Mattson

Cross-Complaint filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William. Refers to: Mattson, Monte

Summons on Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William. Refers to: Mattson, Monte

Speedway Constructors, Inc. and William Forero's Answer to Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial

Answer filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William.

Proof of Service of Summons - William Forero

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Forero, William

Proof of Service of Summons - Speedway Constructors

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Summons

Original Summons filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William

Complaint

Complaint filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mattson, Monte D.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2018

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Mattson, Monte D .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Speedway Constructors Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Forero, William .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Mattson, Monte D .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Speedway Constructors Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018

DocketAmended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Forero, William .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mattson, Monte D. Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Mattson, Monte D; Mattson, Monte D. Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Cross - Defendant); Mattson, Monte D (Cross - Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by Mattson, Monte D; Mattson, Monte D. Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Cross - Defendant); Mattson, Monte D (Cross - Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
10/10/2017
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William. Filed By: Speedway Constructors Inc (Defendant); Forero, William (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Forero, William Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2017
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2017

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2017

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2017
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Mattson, Monte D. Refers to: Speedway Constructors Inc; Forero, William Filed By: Mattson, Monte D (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less