Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 07:32:57 (UTC).

Molina vs Fay Servicing LLC

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Molina filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Fay Servicing LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Molina, Domonique

Defendants

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Fay Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yaeckel, Eric K

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Ex Parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketThe Ex Parte was rescheduled to 06/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in C-71 before Gregory W Pollack at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 06/01/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation Filed By: Molina, Domonique (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation Filed By: Molina, Domonique (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Molina, Domonique. Refers to: Fay Servicing LLC; Quality Loan Service Corporation Filed By: Molina, Domonique (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fay Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAECKEL ERIC