This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 04:43:02 (UTC).

Mojaver DMD vs Office of Administrative Hearings

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 Mojaver DMD filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Office of Administrative Hearings. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina

Respondent

Office of Administrative Hearings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hoynacki, David A

Attorney at WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

401 West A Street Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Refers to: Office of Administrative Hearings

Petition - Other (Case Initiation)

[A document for ROA# 1]

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (of David A Hoynacki in support of ex parte) filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of ex parte) filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina.

Ex Parte Application for Stay (Ex Parte)

Ex Parte Application for Stay filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (Oppositionto Petitioner's Request for Stay) filed by Office of Administrative Hearings.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate dismissed with prejudice as to Office of Administrative Hearings.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other (Oppositionto Petitioner's Request for Stay) filed by Office of Administrative Hearings. Filed By: Office of Administrative Hearings (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Stay filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of ex parte) filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of David A Hoynacki in support of ex parte) filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Refers to: Office of Administrative Hearings Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Refers to: Office of Administrative Hearings Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina. Refers to: Office of Administrative Hearings Filed By: Mojaver DMD, Mahnaz Nina (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOYNACKI DAVID A.