This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/03/2018 at 05:23:44 (UTC).

Mohd Zakir Hussain vs. American Aviation Academy Inc

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 Mohd Zakir Hussain filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against American Aviation Academy Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUSSAIN, SIMKEY

HUSSAIN, MOHD ZAKIR

Defendant

AMERICAN AVIATION ACADEMY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVENDOSKY, KEITH

2800 28Th St #200

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorney

BEHAR, JEFFREY S

Attorney at ONE WORLD TRADE CENTER

1 World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/20/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference) filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Aviation Academy Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/19/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Aviation Academy Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir.

Answer

Answer filed by American Aviation Academy Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by American Aviation Academy Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by American Aviation Academy Inc.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference) filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/20/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 07/20/2018 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by American Aviation Academy Inc. Filed By: American Aviation Academy Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/19/2018 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 04/20/2018 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Demand for Jury Trial filed by American Aviation Academy Inc. Filed By: American Aviation Academy Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by American Aviation Academy Inc. Filed By: American Aviation Academy Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir. Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Hussain, Mohd Zakir; Hussain, Simkey. Refers to: American Aviation Academy Inc Filed By: Hussain, Mohd Zakir (Plaintiff); Hussain, Simkey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEHAR JEFFREY S. ESQ.