This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 01:42:38 (UTC).

MJP ENTERPRISES INC vs. David Crowe

Case Summary

On 10/25/2010 MJP ENTERPRISES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against David Crowe. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MJP ENTERPRISES INC

Defendants

MATHEWS, EDWARD

PAC WEST FIRE INC

BAUTISTA, PAUL

CROWE, DAVID

PAC WEST FIRE LLC

FIRE TRUCKS PLUS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LONDON, MICHAEL

Attorney at MICHAEL D LONDON APC

1111 Sixth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default was rescheduled to 10/11/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in S-04 before William S. Cannon at South County.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Mathews, Edward on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC .

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default scheduled for 08/22/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Mathews, Edward on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC .

Notice of Hearing SD

Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default was rescheduled to 10/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in S-04 before William S. Cannon at South County.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to Request Entry of Default heard 10/17/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/24/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 05/09/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Mathews, Edward on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC .

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/27/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for MJP ENTERPRISES INC and against Pac West Fire LLC;Crowe, David ;Pac West Fire Inc;Mathews, Edward for $ 4424.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 3675.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 1003.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 9102.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • Judgment filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Crowe, David; Pac West Fire Inc; Pac West Fire LLC; Mathews, Edward Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 05/24/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • The Ex Parte Application to Have Judgement Signed was granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (TO SIGN DEFAULT JUDGMENT AFTER PROVE UP HEARING) filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 05/24/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-07 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 05/09/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Judgment rendered, Atty. London directed to prepare the judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • The Court finds judgment on the Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 for MJP ENTERPRISES INC and against David Crowe, Pac West Fire LLC, Edward Mathews, Pac West Fire Inc in the amount of: $4424 principal, $0 punitive damages, $3675 attorney fees, $0 interest, $1003 prejudgment costs and $0 other costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2010
  • Order - Other (Amended Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment) filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Bautista, Paul; Crowe, David; Fire Trucks Plus Inc; Pac West Fire Inc; Pac West Fire LLC Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/27/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • The Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Writ of Attachment was GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT) filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 10/27/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Original Summons filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Crowe, David; Pac West Fire LLC; Mathews, Edward; Pac West Fire Inc; Bautista, Paul; Fire Trucks Plus Inc Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Crowe, David; Pac West Fire LLC; Mathews, Edward; Pac West Fire Inc; Bautista, Paul; Fire Trucks Plus Inc Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by MJP ENTERPRISES INC. Refers to: Crowe, David; Pac West Fire LLC; Mathews, Edward; Pac West Fire Inc; Bautista, Paul; Fire Trucks Plus Inc Filed By: MJP ENTERPRISES INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.